Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 3028 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 17071 Week
» 82025 Month
» 284689 Year
» 3311542 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
12071 |
31/08/1950 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
31/08/1950 |
|
No train brakes |
WR ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
31/08/1950 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 12071 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Toton (18A) |
|
|
30/04/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyseley (84E) |
|
|
03/01/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (18A) |
|
|
21/05/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Buxton (LNWR) (9D) |
|
|
16/07/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (18A) |
|
|
08/10/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Northampton (2E) |
|
|
25/02/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
01/12/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A) |
|
|
10/08/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
04/10/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
21/01/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
09/09/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Monument Lane (21E) |
|
|
22/04/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (2F) |
|
|
11/01/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A) |
|
|
10/10/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (8H) |
|
|
14/11/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 12071 |
|
|
06/1995 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Coopers Metals: at South Yorkshire Railway, Meadowhall |
|
|