Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 29 Online
» 3195 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16601 Week
» 69617 Month
» 189144 Year
» 3215997 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
12087 |
31/12/1950 |
|
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 05/1970 |
|
Radio telephone fitted |
|
|
|
|
07/1971 |
|
Radio telephone removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
31/12/1950 |
|
No train brakes |
WR ATC |
|
|
by 05/1970 |
r |
No train brakes, Radio Telephone fitted |
WR ATC |
|
|
07/1971 |
|
No train brakes |
WR ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
31/12/1950 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 12087 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Carlisle Canal (12B) |
|
|
24/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12A) |
|
|
30/04/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyseley (84E) |
|
|
24/01/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12A) |
|
|
18/02/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (68A) |
|
|
05/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bushbury (21C) |
|
|
24/03/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (21B) |
|
|
16/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ryecroft (Walsall) (2G) |
|
|
22/04/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (2F) |
|
|
05/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Radio telephone fitted |
|
|
07/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Radio telephone removed |
|
|
17/07/1971 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 12087 |
|
|
04/1973 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cohens: Kettering |
|
|