Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 4850 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 18893 Week
» 83847 Month
» 286511 Year
» 3313364 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
12094 |
06/10/1951 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
06/10/1951 |
|
No train brakes |
WR ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/10/1951 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 12094 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Bushbury (3B) |
|
|
17/10/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stourbridge Junction (2C) |
|
|
22/04/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (2F) |
|
|
07/10/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
11/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Allerton (8J) |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 12094 |
|
|
08/1972 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|