Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 798 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14841 Week
» 79795 Month
» 282459 Year
» 3309312 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
12112 |
02/07/1952 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
02/07/1952 |
|
No train brakes |
WR ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/07/1952 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 12112 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Hornsey (34B) |
|
|
17/09/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) |
|
|
11/10/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hornsey (34B) |
|
|
30/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
08/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London (Midland) (D14) |
|
|
19/08/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (2F) |
|
|
02/11/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (2E) |
|
|
18/10/1969 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 12112 |
|
|
09/1970 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|