Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 540 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18343 Week
» 71359 Month
» 190886 Year
» 3217739 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
12113 |
19/07/1952 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
19/07/1952 |
|
No train brakes |
WR ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
19/07/1952 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 12113 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) |
|
|
23/01/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Springhead (53C) |
|
|
28/01/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lees (Oldham) (26E) |
|
|
18/02/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lees (Oldham) (26E) |
|
|
24/03/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Springhead (53C) |
|
|
25/02/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Normanton (55E) |
|
|
25/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Royston (55D) |
|
|
14/03/1971 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 12113 |
|
|
08/1971 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cohens: Kettering |
|
|