Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1449 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14855 Week
» 67871 Month
» 187398 Year
» 3214251 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
12125 |
18/10/1952 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
18/10/1952 |
|
No train brakes |
WR ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
18/10/1952 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 12125 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Kings Cross (34A) |
|
|
18/02/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
22/11/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
28/06/1969 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 12125 |
|
|
10/1969 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by J McWilliams: Shettleston |
|
|