Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 2 Online
» 308 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18111 Week
» 71127 Month
» 190654 Year
» 3217507 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
(1946) |
8002 |
22/03/1945 |
|
Post 1948 |
15002 |
17/06/1950 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
DES1 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
370 |
Works Number |
1973 |
To Service |
22/03/1945 to Stratford (STR) |
Withdrawn |
05/08/1967 off Crewe South (5B) |
Time in Service |
22 yrs, 4 mths , 14 dys |
Cut Up |
10/1968 |
Cut At |
R A Kings (Norwich) |
Information |
Work started on construction in early 1944 but was by a parts shortage. Trialed at Doncaster Works shunter from 5th December 1944. |
Status |
Scrapped |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
22/03/1945 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
WR ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
22/03/1945 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway number D8002 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1973 Allocated to Stratford (STR) |
|
|
20/06/1945 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (MAR) |
|
|
17/06/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 15002 |
|
|
15/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Crewe Diesel (5A) |
|
|
05/02/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (5A) |
|
|
05/02/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke (5D) |
|
|
23/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
05/08/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 15002 from Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
10/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by R A Kings: Norwich |
|
|