Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 23 Today
» 818 Yesterday
» 841 Week
» 17792 Month
» 170745 Year
» 1836121 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
  1 30/09/1937  
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 15201 19/06/1951  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built D3/12
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/09/1937
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service 30/09/1937
Withdrawn 29/11/1964
Time in Service 27 yrs, 1 mth , 30 dys
Cut Up 01/09/1969
Cut At Cohens (Morriston)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
  (New) on 30/09/1937
NORW Norwood Junction on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
73C Hither Green 4w/e 01/02/1962
71A Eastleigh 4w/e 19/08/1963
   Withdrawn on 29/11/1964


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
30/09/1937 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation dnapshot - Norwood Junction (NORW)    
19/06/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 15201    
01/02/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (73C)    
19/08/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
29/11/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 15201    
01/09/1969 Scrapped Broken up by Cohens: Morriston    

prev