Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 34 Today
» 753 Yesterday
» 2832 Week
» 14514 Month
» 167467 Year
» 1832843 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
  2 30/09/1937  
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 15202 13/11/1948  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built D3/12
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/09/1937
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service 30/09/1937
Withdrawn 13/12/1964
Time in Service 27 yrs, 2 mths , 13 dys
Cut Up 01/05/1966
Cut At Cashmore's (Newport)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
  (New) on 30/09/1937
NORW Norwood Junction on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
91W To Western Region / GWR
(Used to shunt Acton yard.)
4w/e 30/04/1951
75C Norwood Junction 8w/e 20/07/1953
73C Hither Green 3w/e 17/11/1956
73F Ashford m/e 09/12/1963
   Withdrawn on 13/12/1964


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
30/09/1937 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 2
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation dnapshot - Norwood Junction (NORW)    
13/11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 15202    
30/04/1951 Allocation Reallocated to To Western Region / GWR (91W) (Used to shunt Acton yard.)    
20/07/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Norwood Junction (75C)    
17/11/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (73C)    
09/12/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford (73F)    
13/12/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 15202    
01/05/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev