Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 580 Today
» 681 Yesterday
» 4262 Week
» 10970 Month
» 163923 Year
» 1829299 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 15212 09/04/1949  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 12
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
1209/04/1949
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
Order Number 3413
To Service 09/04/1949
Withdrawn 31/12/1971
Time in Service 22 yrs, 8 mths , 22 dys
Cut Up 01/11/1972
Cut At Cashmore's (Newport)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
  (New) w/e 09/04/1949
73C Hither Green 4w/e 01/05/1962
   Withdrawn on 31/12/1971


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
09/04/1949 To Service To service as British Railways Number 15212
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/05/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (73C)    
31/12/1971 Withdrawn Condemned as 15212    
01/11/1972 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev