Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 582 Today
» 681 Yesterday
» 4264 Week
» 10972 Month
» 163925 Year
» 1829301 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 15213 16/04/1949  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 12
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
1216/04/1949
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
Order Number 3413
To Service 16/04/1949
Withdrawn 03/11/1968
Time in Service 19 yrs, 6 mths , 18 dys
Cut Up 01/03/1970
Cut At British Rail (at Hither Green MPD)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
  (New) w/e 16/04/1949
73C Hither Green 4w/e 01/02/1962
   Withdrawn on 03/11/1968


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
16/04/1949 To Service To service as British Railways Number 15213
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/02/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (73C)    
03/11/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as 15213    
01/03/1970 Scrapped Broken up by British Rail: at Hither Green MPD    

prev prev