Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 33 Today
» 753 Yesterday
» 2831 Week
» 14513 Month
» 167466 Year
» 1832842 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 15216 04/06/1949  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 12
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
1204/06/1949
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
Order Number 3413
To Service 04/06/1949 to Norwood Junction (NORW)
Withdrawn 28/04/1969
Time in Service 19 yrs, 10 mths , 24 dys
Cut Up 02/1970
Cut At Locomotive Works (Swindon)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
NORW Norwood Junction (New) w/e 04/06/1949
73C Hither Green 3w/e 09/05/1955
70C Guildford 7w/e 08/10/1957
73C Hither Green 4w/e 24/02/1958
73F Ashford m/e 12/10/1964
   Withdrawn on 28/04/1969


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
04/06/1949 To Service To service as British Railways Number 15216
Built at Ashford Works
Allocated to Norwood Junction (NORW)
   
09/05/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (73C)    
08/10/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
24/02/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (73C)    
12/10/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford (73F)    
28/04/1969 Withdrawn Condemned as 15216    
02/1970 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev