Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 578 Today
» 681 Yesterday
» 4260 Week
» 10968 Month
» 163921 Year
» 1829297 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 15220 23/07/1949  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 12
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
1223/07/1949
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
Order Number 3413
To Service 23/07/1949
Withdrawn 31/10/1971
Time in Service 22 yrs, 3 mths , 8 dys
Cut Up 01/11/1972
Cut At Cashmore's (Newport)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
  (New) w/e 23/07/1949
75C Norwood Junction 9w/e 30/06/1952
73C Hither Green 8w/e 20/07/1953
74A Ashford 4w/e 24/02/1958
73C Hither Green m/e 12/10/1964
   Withdrawn on 31/10/1971


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
23/07/1949 To Service To service as British Railways Number 15220
Built at Ashford Works
   
30/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Norwood Junction (75C)    
20/07/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (73C)    
24/02/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford (74A)    
12/10/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (73C)    
31/10/1971 Withdrawn Condemned as 15220    
01/11/1972 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev