Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 36 Today
» 818 Yesterday
» 854 Week
» 17805 Month
» 170758 Year
» 1836134 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 15221 20/08/1949  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 12
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
1220/08/1949
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
Order Number 3413
To Service 20/08/1949
Withdrawn 31/10/1971
Time in Service 22 yrs, 2 mths , 11 dys
Cut Up 01/05/1972
Cut At Cashmore's (Newport)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
  (New) w/e 20/08/1949
73F Ashford 4w/e 05/03/1962
73E Faversham m/e 09/12/1963
73F Ashford m/e 27/01/1964
70D Eastleigh w/e 05/02/1968
73C Hither Green 4w/e 30/04/1970
   Withdrawn on 31/10/1971


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
20/08/1949 To Service To service as British Railways Number 15221
Built at Ashford Works
   
05/03/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford (73F)    
09/12/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Faversham (73E)    
27/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford (73F)    
05/02/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D)    
30/04/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (73C)    
31/10/1971 Withdrawn Condemned as 15221    
01/05/1972 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev