Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 542 Today
» 681 Yesterday
» 4224 Week
» 10932 Month
» 163885 Year
» 1829261 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 15227 03/02/1951  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 12
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
1203/02/1951
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
Order Number 3537
To Service 03/02/1951 to Hither Green (73C)
Withdrawn 30/04/1970
Time in Service 19 yrs, 2 mths , 27 dys
Cut Up 01/06/1970
Cut At Locomotive Works (Eastleigh)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
73C Hither Green (New) w/e 03/02/1951
74A Ashford 4w/e 24/02/1958
   Withdrawn on 30/04/1970


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
03/02/1951 To Service To service as British Railways Number 15227
Built at Ashford Works
Allocated to Hither Green (73C)
   
24/02/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford (74A)    
30/04/1970 Withdrawn Condemned as 15227    
01/06/1970 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Eastleigh    

prev prev