Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 27 Today
» 818 Yesterday
» 845 Week
» 17796 Month
» 170749 Year
» 1836125 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 15228 28/04/1951  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 12
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
1228/04/1951
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
Order Number 3537
To Service 28/04/1951 to Hither Green (73C)
Withdrawn 06/01/1969
Time in Service 17 yrs, 8 mths , 9 dys
Cut Up 01/07/1969
Cut At Locomotive Works (Swindon)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
73C Hither Green (New) w/e 28/04/1951
74A Ashford 4w/e 24/02/1958
   Withdrawn on 06/01/1969


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
28/04/1951 To Service To service as British Railways Number 15228
Built at Ashford Works
Allocated to Hither Green (73C)
   
24/02/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford (74A)    
06/01/1969 Withdrawn Condemned as 15228    
01/07/1969 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev