Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 586 Today
» 681 Yesterday
» 4268 Week
» 10976 Month
» 163929 Year
» 1829305 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 15231 20/10/1951  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 12
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
1220/10/1951
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
Order Number 3537
To Service 20/10/1951
Withdrawn 31/10/1971
Time in Service 20 yrs , 11 dys
Cut Up 01/02/1984
Cut At Tilcon (Grassington)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
  (New) w/e 20/10/1951
71A Eastleigh 5w/e 14/02/1953
70F Bournemouth 4w/e 09/07/1967
73F Ashford Chart Leacon w/e 05/02/1968
   Withdrawn on 31/10/1971


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
20/10/1951 To Service To service as British Railways Number 15231
Built at Ashford Works
   
14/02/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
09/07/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Bournemouth (70F)    
05/02/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford Chart Leacon (73F)    
31/10/1971 Withdrawn Condemned as 15231    
01/02/1984 Scrapped Broken up by Tilcon: Grassington    

prev prev