Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 528 Today
» 681 Yesterday
» 4210 Week
» 10918 Month
» 163871 Year
» 1829247 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 15234 01/12/1951  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 12
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
1201/12/1951
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
Order Number 3537
To Service 01/12/1951 to Hither Green (73C)
Withdrawn 22/12/1968
Time in Service 17 yrs , 21 dys
Cut Up 01/02/1970
Cut At Locomotive Works (Swindon)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
73C Hither Green (New) w/e 01/12/1951
71A Eastleigh 5w/e 11/03/1955
   Withdrawn on 22/12/1968


Works Visits
Where Repaired Date Stopped Days Since Last Stopped Works Entry Departure Class of Repair Waiting Repair Decision Waiting Works On Works Total Duration Cost of Repair Mileage Notes
Eastleigh Works 10/06/1960 n/a 10/06/1960 11/06/1960 Light Casual       2 days   63,462 Mileage since last General

Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
01/12/1951 To Service To service as British Railways Number 15234
Built at Ashford Works
Allocated to Hither Green (73C)
   
11/03/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
10/06/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/06/1960. Dep: 11/06/1960.
Stopped on 10/06/1960
   
22/12/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as 15234    
01/02/1970 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev