Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 537 Today
» 681 Yesterday
» 4219 Week
» 10927 Month
» 163880 Year
» 1829256 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 15235 15/12/1951  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 12
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
1215/12/1951
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
Order Number 3537
To Service 15/12/1951 to Norwood Junction (75C)
Withdrawn 31/05/1971
Time in Service 19 yrs, 5 mths , 16 dys
Cut Up 01/11/1972
Cut At Cashmore's (Newport)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
75C Norwood Junction (New) w/e 15/12/1951
73C Hither Green 5w/e 14/02/1953
71A Eastleigh 6w/e 21/06/1955
73C Hither Green w/e 09/06/1969
   Withdrawn on 31/05/1971


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
15/12/1951 To Service To service as British Railways Number 15235
Built at Ashford Works
Allocated to Norwood Junction (75C)
   
14/02/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (73C)    
21/06/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
09/06/1969 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (73C)    
31/05/1971 Withdrawn Condemned as 15235    
01/11/1972 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev