Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1297 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19100 Week
» 72116 Month
» 191643 Year
» 3218496 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D182 |
27/09/1962 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
46045 |
06/09/1973 |
|
Departmental (Dept) |
97404 |
12/1984 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
46 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
1Co-Co1 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Spanner Mk 3 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Central Headcode Box |
|
To Service |
27/09/1962 to Gateshead (52A) |
Withdrawn |
01/11/1984 |
Time in Service |
22 yrs, 1 mth , 5 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 10/1970 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 30/12/1970 |
|
Allocations - WIP
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
52A |
|
Gateshead (New) |
on |
27/09/1962 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
01/11/1984 |
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
11/09/1970 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
27/09/1962 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
11/09/1970 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
27/09/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D182 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
11/09/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
10/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
30/12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
06/09/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 46045 |
|
|
01/11/1984 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 46045 |
|
|
12/1984 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 97404 |
|
|