Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1519 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19322 Week
» 72338 Month
» 191865 Year
» 3218718 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D187 |
23/11/1962 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
46050 |
02/02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
46 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
1Co-Co1 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Spanner Mk 3 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Central Headcode Box |
|
To Service |
23/11/1962 to Gateshead (52A) |
Withdrawn |
26/10/1982 |
Time in Service |
19 yrs, 11 mths , 3 dys |
Cut Up |
24/02/1985 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 30/12/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
04/03/1972 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
23/11/1962 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
04/03/1972 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
23/11/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D187 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
11/07/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
30/12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
04/03/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
27/01/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
02/02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 46050 |
|
|
29/11/1981 |
Reinstated |
Reinstated to Gateshead (GD) |
|
|
26/10/1982 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 46050 |
|
|
24/02/1985 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|