Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 745 Today
» 779 Yesterday
» 4860 Week
» 12975 Month
» 140418 Year
» 1805794 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D1937 07/04/1966  
TOPS (47/4) 47495 02/1974  
TOPS (47/7) 47704 02/1979  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 47
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
47/007/04/1966
47/405/1972
Wheels Co-Co
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Works Number 699
To Service 07/04/1966 to Cardiff Canton (86A)
Withdrawn 01/05/1997
Time in Service 31 yrs , 24 dys
Cut Up 01/12/2006
Cut At Ron Hull Jr. (Rotherham)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
86A Cardiff Canton (New) on 07/04/1966
82A Bristol Bath Road 9w/e 09/11/1968
LE Landore w/e 11/05/1974
ED Eastfield on 04/10/1987
   Withdrawn on 01/05/1997

Modifications
Date Modified Order Number Modification Status Charged to Capital Charged to Revenue Total Cost
05/1972   Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted        
05/1972   Boiler Removed        


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
07/04/1966 To Service To service as British Railways Number 1937
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 699
Allocated to Cardiff Canton (86A)
   
09/11/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A)    
05/1972 Modification Modification: Boiler Removed    
05/1972 Modification Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted    
02/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 47495    
11/05/1974 Allocation Reallocated to Landore (LE)    
02/1979 Renumbered Renumbered to 47704    
04/10/1987 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (ED)    
01/05/1997 Withdrawn Condemned as 47704    
01/12/2006 Scrapped Broken up by Ron Hull Jr.: Rotherham    

prev prev