Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 183 Today
» 997 Yesterday
» 3215 Week
» 21267 Month
» 254187 Year
» 1919563 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D1966 02/10/1965  
TOPS (47/0) 47266 02/1974  
TOPS (47/4) 47629 11/11/1985  
TOPS (47/8) 47828 01/06/1989  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 47
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
47/002/10/1965
47/411/11/1985
47/801/06/1989
Wheels Co-Co
Builder Crewe Works
To Service 02/10/1965 to Cardiff Canton (86A)
Status In Service

Allocations
Code Name Date From
86A Cardiff Canton (New) on 02/10/1965
WL Western Lines (LMR) w/e 18/06/1966
D05 Stoke Division on 17/06/1968
BR Bristol Bath Road on 15/05/1988

Modifications
Date Modified Order Number Modification Status Charged to Capital Charged to Revenue Total Cost
09/1976   Dual AWS Removed        
06/1986   Headlight(s) fitted        


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
02/10/1965 To Service To service as British Railways Number 1966
Built at Crewe Works
Allocated to Cardiff Canton (86A)
   
18/06/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL)    
17/06/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05)    
02/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 47266    
09/1976 Modification Modification: Dual AWS Removed    
11/11/1985 Renumbered Renumbered to 47629    
06/1986 Modification Modification: Headlight(s) fitted    
15/05/1988 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR)    
01/06/1989 Renumbered Renumbered to 47828    

prev prev