Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 725 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19636 Week
» 84590 Month
» 287254 Year
» 3314107 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2047 |
19/12/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
03047 |
03/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
19/12/1958 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
19/12/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2047 Built at Doncaster Works Allocated to Heaton (52B) |
|
|
19/09/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sunderland (52G) |
|
|
08/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Percy Main (52E) |
|
|
18/07/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
20/07/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (55B) |
|
|
14/12/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Healey Mills (55C) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 03047 |
|
|
30/07/1979 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 03047 |
|
|
10/1979 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|