Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 723 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14129 Week
» 67145 Month
» 186672 Year
» 3213525 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2050 |
17/01/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
03050 |
04/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
03 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
To Service |
17/01/1959 to Blaydon (52C) |
Withdrawn |
07/08/1978 |
Reason for Withdrawal |
Rundown condition |
Time in Service |
19 yrs, 6 mths , 21 dys |
Cut Up |
05/1979 |
Cut At |
C F Booth (Rotherham) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 08/1969 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
17/01/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
17/01/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2050 Built at Doncaster Works Allocated to Blaydon (52C) |
|
|
19/09/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sunderland (52G) |
|
|
08/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Percy Main (52E) |
|
|
08/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
20/11/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 03050 |
|
|
07/08/1978 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 03050 |
|
|
05/1979 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|