Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1177 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18980 Week
» 71996 Month
» 191523 Year
» 3218376 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2077 |
07/12/1959 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 08/1969 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
07/12/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/12/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2077 Built at Doncaster Works Allocated to West Hartlepool (51C) |
|
|
25/06/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
25/02/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C) |
|
|
07/10/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
08/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
01/10/1972 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2077 from Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
04/1973 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|