Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 404 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18207 Week
» 71223 Month
» 190750 Year
» 3217603 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2083 |
06/03/1959 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
06/03/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/03/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2083 Built at Doncaster Works Allocated to Hither Green (73C) |
|
|
18/03/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ashford (73F) |
|
|
01/02/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
05/03/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hither Green (73C) |
|
|
24/10/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D) |
|
|
31/05/1969 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2083 |
|
|
11/1969 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Pollock and Brown: Southampton |
|
|