Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 385 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18188 Week
» 71204 Month
» 190731 Year
» 3217584 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2104 |
24/09/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
03104 |
02/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
24/09/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
24/09/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2104 Built at Doncaster Works Allocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
01/10/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (56G) |
|
|
15/10/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Percy Main (52E) |
|
|
19/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
26/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton (52B) |
|
|
08/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Percy Main (52E) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 03104 |
|
|
17/06/1975 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 03104 |
|
|
02/1976 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|