Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1417 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19220 Week
» 72236 Month
» 191763 Year
» 3218616 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2390 |
16/05/1961 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
16/05/1961 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
16/05/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2390 Built at Doncaster Works Allocated to Gorton (9G) |
|
|
12/10/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
06/08/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
03/06/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) |
|
|
06/01/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carnforth (10A) |
|
|
11/05/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2390 from Carnforth (10A) |
|
|
11/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cohens: Kettering |
|
|