Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 185 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17988 Week
» 71004 Month
» 190531 Year
» 3217384 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2392 |
16/06/1961 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
16/06/1961 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
16/06/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2392 Built at Doncaster Works Allocated to Gorton (9G) |
|
|
29/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B) |
|
|
28/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
01/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
03/06/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carnforth (10A) |
|
|
18/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Allerton (8J) |
|
|
17/01/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (12C) |
|
|
28/03/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
19/06/1971 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2392 |
|
|
02/1972 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|