Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 4254 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17660 Week
» 70676 Month
» 190203 Year
» 3217056 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13009 |
27/12/1952 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3009 |
13/07/1957 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08005 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
by 07/1970 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 12/1975 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
27/12/1952 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
27/12/1952 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13009 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Hurlford (67B) |
|
|
13/07/1957 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3009 |
|
|
05/11/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B) |
|
|
04/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
07/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
|
|
26/06/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Allerton (8J) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08005 |
|
|
12/1975 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
04/12/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (BS) |
|
|
15/10/1978 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08005 from Bescot (BS) |
|
|
12/1979 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|