Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 317 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18120 Week
» 71136 Month
» 190663 Year
» 3217516 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13012 |
23/12/1952 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3012 |
27/02/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08007 |
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
23/12/1952 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
23/12/1952 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13012 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Hither Green (73C) |
|
|
06/11/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
27/02/1960 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3012 |
|
|
1973 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 08007 but not taken up |
|
|
28/01/1973 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3012 from Eastleigh (70D) |
|
|
10/1973 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|