Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 31 Today
» 861 Yesterday
» 5324 Week
» 31 Month
» 203521 Year
» 1868897 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 13022 16/05/1953  
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3022 04/02/1961  
TOPS (Tops) 08015 26/01/1974  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
0816/05/1953
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
Order Number 232
To Service 16/05/1953 to Cricklewood East (14A)
Withdrawn 21/09/1980 off Tinsley (TI)
Time in Service 27 yrs, 4 mths , 5 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
14A Cricklewood East (New) on 16/05/1953
30A Stratford w/e 24/06/1972
SB Shirebrook w/e 26/01/1974
   Withdrawn on 21/09/1980

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
16/05/1953 To Service To service as British Railways Number 13022
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Cricklewood East (14A)
   
04/02/1961 Renumbered Renumbered to 3022    
24/06/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
26/01/1974 Allocation Reallocated to Shirebrook (SB)    
26/01/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08015    
21/09/1980 Withdrawn Condemned as 08015 from Tinsley (TI)    

prev prev