Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1382 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19185 Week
» 72201 Month
» 191728 Year
» 3218581 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13041 |
27/01/1954 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3041 |
21/12/1957 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08029 |
05/1974 |
|
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 07/1975 |
|
Radio telephone fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
27/01/1954 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
by 07/1975 |
vr |
Vacuum brakes, Radio Telephone fitted |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
27/01/1954 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13041 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Feltham (70B) |
|
|
21/12/1957 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3041 |
|
|
06/10/1968 |
To Store |
To Store |
|
|
09/12/1968 |
Reinstated |
Reinstated to Feltham (70B) |
|
|
10/02/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
29/12/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Selhurst (75C) |
|
|
19/07/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (EH) |
|
|
09/03/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (EJ) |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08029 |
|
|
07/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Radio telephone fitted |
|
|
05/03/1978 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08029 from Ebbw Junction (Newport) (EJ) |
|
|
05/1978 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|