Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 288 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18091 Week
» 71107 Month
» 190634 Year
» 3217487 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13047 |
14/04/1954 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3047 |
11/01/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08034 |
|
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
08 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
14/04/1954 to Hither Green (73C) |
Withdrawn |
15/07/1973 |
Time in Service |
19 yrs, 3 mths , 1 dy |
Information |
Subsequently exported to LAMCO Liberia |
Status |
Awaiting Scrapping |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
14/04/1954 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
14/04/1954 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13047 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Hither Green (73C) |
|
|
08/02/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwood Junction (75C) |
|
|
11/01/1958 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3047 |
|
|
05/03/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Guildford (70C) |
|
|
09/07/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Feltham (70B) |
|
|
01/01/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D) |
|
|
1973 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 08034 but not taken up |
|
|
15/07/1973 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3047 |
|
|