Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 31 Online
» 2762 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16168 Week
» 69184 Month
» 188711 Year
» 3215564 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13145 |
22/06/1955 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3145 |
15/06/1957 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow ends, black chevrons |
by 07/1971 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
22/06/1955 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
22/06/1955 |
Power Unit IH64392 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
22/06/1955 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13145 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Newport (Teeside) (51B) |
|
|
01/01/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Darlington (51A) |
|
|
15/06/1957 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3145 |
|
|
08/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
07/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow ends, black chevrons |
|
|
23/04/1972 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3145 from Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
12/1972 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|