Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 949 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18752 Week
» 71768 Month
» 191295 Year
» 3218148 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13158 |
25/03/1955 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3158 |
03/12/1959 |
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
25/03/1955 |
Power Unit IH63722 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
25/03/1955 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13158 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
18/02/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) |
|
|
18/05/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
03/12/1959 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3158 |
|
|
19/02/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3158 |
|
|
08/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Slag Reduction Co.: Ickles |
|
|