Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 461 Today
» 2338 Yesterday
» 5364 Week
» 81466 Month
» 566685 Year
» 2967149 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13201 |
16/12/1955 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3201 |
31/03/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08133 |
12/10/1973 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
08 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
16/12/1955 to Polmadie (66A) |
Withdrawn |
21/09/1980 off Lincoln (LN) |
Time in Service |
24 yrs, 9 mths , 5 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
16/12/1955 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
16/12/1955 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13201 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
31/03/1960 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3201 |
|
|
07/09/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hamilton (West) (66C) |
|
|
30/05/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Corkerhill (67A) |
|
|
26/03/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ayr (67C) |
|
|
26/10/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) |
|
|
12/10/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08133 |
|
|
21/09/1980 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08133 from Lincoln (LN) |
|
|