Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 290 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18093 Week
» 71109 Month
» 190636 Year
» 3217489 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13224 |
25/06/1955 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3224 |
15/03/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08156 |
01/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
25/06/1955 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
25/06/1955 |
Power Unit IH3408 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
25/06/1955 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13224 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Norwood Junction (75C) |
|
|
15/03/1958 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3224 |
|
|
30/09/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hither Green (73C) |
|
|
03/06/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ashford Chart Leacon (73F) |
|
|
01/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08156 |
|
|
02/01/1979 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08156 from Ashford Chart Leacon (AF) |
|
|
02/1980 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|