Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 1104 Today
» 1072 Yesterday
» 7787 Week
» 18833 Month
» 18833 Year
» 1684209 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3551 03/10/1958  
TOPS (Tops) 08436 03/1974  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
0803/10/1958
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service 03/10/1958 to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)
Withdrawn 10/01/1992 off Doncaster (DR)
Time in Service 33 yrs, 3 mths , 7 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill (New) on 03/10/1958
61A Kittybrewster 4w/e 01/07/1961
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 5w/e 30/09/1967
60A Inverness 5w/e 01/03/1969
36A Doncaster w/e 26/02/1972
40B Immingham w/e 06/05/1972
   Withdrawn on 10/01/1992

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
03/10/1958 To Service To service as British Railways Number D3551
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)
   
01/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Kittybrewster (61A)    
30/09/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
01/03/1969 Allocation Reallocated to Inverness (60A)    
26/02/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
06/05/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
03/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08436 (Tops)    
10/01/1992 Withdrawn Condemned as 08436 from Doncaster (DR)    

prev prev