Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1347 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19150 Week
» 72166 Month
» 191693 Year
» 3218546 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3657 |
06/05/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08502 |
02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
08 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
To Service |
06/05/1958 to Stourton (55B) |
Withdrawn |
30/10/1988 off Thornaby (TE) |
Time in Service |
30 yrs, 5 mths , 24 dys |
Status |
Awaiting Scrapping |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
06/05/1958 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/05/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3657 Built at Doncaster Works Allocated to Stourton (55B) |
|
|
19/07/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manningham (55F) |
|
|
14/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neville Hill (55H) |
|
|
14/08/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08502 |
|
|
30/10/1988 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08502 from Thornaby (TE) |
|
|