Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 317 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19228 Week
» 84182 Month
» 286846 Year
» 3313699 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3663 |
20/06/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08508 |
03/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
20/06/1958 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
20/06/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3663 Built at Doncaster Works Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
|
|
02/05/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41B) |
|
|
09/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
01/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E) |
|
|
30/11/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
20/02/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Frodingham (36C) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08508 |
|
|
12/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
01/10/1991 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08508 from Immingham (IM) |
|
|
01/1994 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Gwent Demolition: Margam |
|
|