Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 31 Today
» 861 Yesterday
» 5324 Week
» 31 Month
» 203521 Year
» 1868897 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3734 17/04/1959  
TOPS (Tops) 08567 03/1974  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
0817/04/1959
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
To Service 17/04/1959 to St Margarets (64A)
Status In Service

Allocations
Code Name Date From
64A St Margarets (New) on 17/04/1959
64C Dalry Road 4w/e 16/02/1963
62B Dundee Tay Bridge 5w/e 30/10/1965
64H Leith Central 5w/e 30/12/1967
62A Thornton Junction 4w/e 24/02/1968
62C Dunfermline Townhill 5w/e 01/08/1970
36A Doncaster w/e 26/02/1972
50C Hull Botanic Gardens w/e 17/06/1972


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
17/04/1959 To Service To service as British Railways Number 3734
Built at Crewe Works
Allocated to St Margarets (64A)
   
16/02/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Dalry Road (64C)    
30/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B)    
30/12/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Leith Central (64H)    
24/02/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A)    
01/08/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Dunfermline Townhill (62C)    
26/02/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
17/06/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (50C)    
03/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08567    

prev prev