Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 524 Today
» 1013 Yesterday
» 524 Week
» 18576 Month
» 251496 Year
» 1916872 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3800 12/12/1959  
TOPS (Tops) 08633 02/1974  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
0812/12/1959
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service 12/12/1959 to Stoke (5D)
Status In Service

Allocations
Code Name Date From
5D Stoke (New) on 12/12/1959
24J Lancaster Green Ayre w/e 02/01/1960
5D Stoke w/e 13/06/1960
5A Crewe Diesel w/e 05/02/1966
5D Stoke w/e 12/02/1966
5A Crewe Diesel w/e 25/11/1967


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
12/12/1959 To Service To service as British Railways Number 3800
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Stoke (5D)
   
02/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Lancaster Green Ayre (24J)    
13/06/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke (5D)    
05/02/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (5A)    
12/02/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke (5D)    
25/11/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (5A)    
02/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08633    

prev prev