Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 290 Today
» 957 Yesterday
» 4267 Week
» 15504 Month
» 248424 Year
» 1913800 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3850 05/09/1959  
TOPS (Tops) 08683 05/1974  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
0805/09/1959
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
To Service 05/09/1959 to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E)
Status In Service

Allocations
Code Name Date From
9E Trafford Park (LMS) (New) on 05/09/1959
1B Camden w/e 03/10/1959
1A Willesden w/e 03/01/1966
14B Cricklewood West w/e 18/11/1967
1E Bletchley w/e 23/05/1970
1A Willesden w/e 16/09/1972


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
05/09/1959 To Service To service as British Railways Number 3850
Built at Horwich Works
Allocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E)
   
03/10/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Camden (1B)    
03/01/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
18/11/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Cricklewood West (14B)    
23/05/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Bletchley (1E)    
16/09/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
05/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08683    

prev prev