Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 724 Today
» 779 Yesterday
» 4839 Week
» 12954 Month
» 140397 Year
» 1805773 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3879 28/04/1960  
TOPS (Tops) 08712 02/1974  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
0828/04/1960
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
To Service 28/04/1960 to St Margarets (64A)
Withdrawn 11/12/1992 off Motherwell (ML)
Time in Service 32 yrs, 7 mths , 13 dys
Cut Up 15/09/1993
Cut At MC Metals (at Motherwell MPD)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
64A St Margarets (New) on 28/04/1960
64F Bathgate 5w/e 29/01/1966
64B Haymarket 5w/e 24/09/1966
GM Grangemouth 4w/e 26/01/1974
   Withdrawn on 11/12/1992


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
28/04/1960 To Service To service as British Railways Number 3879
Built at Crewe Works
Allocated to St Margarets (64A)
   
29/01/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Bathgate (64F)    
24/09/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Haymarket (64B)    
26/01/1974 Allocation Reallocated to Grangemouth (GM)    
02/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08712    
11/12/1992 Withdrawn Condemned as 08712 from Motherwell (ML)    
15/09/1993 Scrapped Broken up by MC Metals: at Motherwell MPD    

prev prev