Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 121 Today
» 1039 Yesterday
» 5652 Week
» 30486 Month
» 64818 Year
» 1730194 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3978 09/07/1960  
TOPS (Tops) 08810 04/1974  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
0809/07/1960
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service 09/07/1960 to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A)
Status In Service

Allocations
Code Name Date From
86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) (New) on 09/07/1960
84B Oxley 4w/e 13/08/1960
2F Bescot w/e 22/04/1967
BR Bristol Bath Road w/e 15/03/1975
TI Tinsley w/e 22/08/1976
91E To Eastern Region 3w/e 04/09/1976


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
09/07/1960 To Service To service as British Railways Number 3978
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A)
   
13/08/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Oxley (84B)    
22/04/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Bescot (2F)    
04/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08810    
15/03/1975 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR)    
22/08/1976 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (TI)    
04/09/1976 Allocation Reallocated to To Eastern Region (91E)    

prev prev