Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 258 Today
» 957 Yesterday
» 4235 Week
» 15472 Month
» 248392 Year
» 1913768 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D408 22/03/1968  
TOPS (Tops) 50008 01/01/1973  

Names Carried
Name Date From
Thunderer 01/09/1978

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 50
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
5022/03/1968
Wheels Co-Co
Builder English Electric Vulcan Foundry
To Service 22/03/1968 to Western Lines (LMR) (WL)
Withdrawn 05/06/1992
Withdrawal Reason Surplus to requirements
Time in Service 24 yrs, 2 mths , 14 dys
Cut Up 27/04/1993
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
WL Western Lines (LMR) (New) on 22/03/1968
D05 Stoke Division on 17/06/1968
BR Bristol Bath Road 2w/e 10/04/1976
LA Laira w/e 08/05/1976
   Withdrawn on 05/06/1992

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
22/03/1968 To Service To service as British Railways Number 408
Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry
Allocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL)
   
17/06/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 50008    
10/04/1976 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR)    
08/05/1976 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (LA)    
01/09/1978 Naming Named 'Thunderer' at Laira    
05/06/1992 Withdrawn Condemned as 50008    
27/04/1993 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev