Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 199 Today
» 997 Yesterday
» 3231 Week
» 21283 Month
» 254203 Year
» 1919579 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D4100 26/09/1961  
TOPS (09/0) 09012 01/1974  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 09
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
09/026/09/1961
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
To Service 26/09/1961 to Ashford (73F)
Status In Service

Allocations
Code Name Date From
73F Ashford (New) on 26/09/1961
73F Ashford 4w/e 07/02/1966
70B Feltham 4w/e 09/07/1967
75C Selhurst 9w/e 22/07/1970

Modifications
Date Modified Order Number Modification Status Charged to Capital Charged to Revenue Total Cost
11/1968   Air Braked only        


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
26/09/1961 To Service To service as British Railways Number 4100
Built at Horwich Works
Allocated to Ashford (73F)
   
07/02/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford (73F)    
09/07/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Feltham (70B)    
11/1968 Modification Modification: Air Braked only    
22/07/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Selhurst (75C)    
01/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 09012    

prev prev