Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 122 Today
» 1161 Yesterday
» 122 Week
» 6256 Month
» 234140 Year
» 1455705 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D4134 07/06/1962  
TOPS (Tops) 08904 08/1974  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
To Service 07/06/1962
Status In Service

Allocations
Code Name Date From
14E Bedford (New) 07/06/1962
14A Cricklewood East w/e 14/07/1962
1A Willesden w/e 23/05/1970

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
15/04/1962 Sightings Horwich Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop - frames only. SLS 5/1962 Link
07/06/1962 To Service To service as D4134
Built at Horwich Works
Allocated to Bedford (14E)
   
14/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A)    
23/05/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
08/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08904    

prev prev